This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/30/2023 at 08:08:51 (UTC).

RAFGIL TUBIEROS, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED VS MRC GLOBAL (US) INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/10/2022 RAFGIL TUBIEROS, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MRC GLOBAL US INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2672

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAFGIL TUBIEROS, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendant

MRC GLOBAL (US) INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOKOZIAN BRUCE Z.

Defendant Attorneys

CROSNER RYAN H

DICKMAN SHAYNA E

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

10/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

10/14/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Complaint

10/10/2022: Complaint

Order to Show Cause

10/14/2022: Order to Show Cause

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

10/28/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Electronic Rejection Notice

12/16/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

First Amended Complaint

12/14/2022: First Amended Complaint

Electronic Rejection Notice

12/21/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Answer to Complaint

12/21/2022: Answer to Complaint

Notice of Related Case(s)

12/21/2022: Notice of Related Case(s)

Answer to First Amended Complaint

01/18/2023: Answer to First Amended Complaint

Notice of Entry

12/09/2022: Notice of Entry

Case Management Statement

03/28/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

03/28/2023: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

03/28/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Conference

04/12/2023: Case Management Conference

Amended Notice

05/12/2023: Amended Notice

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Further Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Amended Notice; Comment: DEFENDANTS SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS; Filed By: DEFENDANT - MRC GLOBAL (US) INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division J; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Comment: No Proof of Service; Filed By: DEFENDANT - MRC GLOBAL (US) INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RAFAEL TUBIEROS, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILIARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RAFAEL TUBIEROS, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILIARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to First Amended Complaint; Filed By: DEFENDANT - MRC GLOBAL (US) INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Related Case(s); Comment: Notice of Related Case (Notices); Filed By: DEFENDANT - MRC GLOBAL (US) INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Filed By: DEFENDANT - MRC GLOBAL (US) INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: Answer to Complaint: Missing signature

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: Answer to Complaint; Proof of Service Required

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: First Amended Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RAFAEL TUBIEROS, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILIARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Entry; Comment: Notice of Entry of Order Re. 10/14/22; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RAFAEL TUBIEROS, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILIARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: AS TO MRC GLOBAL (US) INC., VIA PERSONAL SERVICE; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RAFAEL TUBIEROS, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILIARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 01/27/2023Hearing Time: 8:30AMHearing Department/Division: J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RAFAEL TUBIEROS, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILIARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RAFAEL TUBIEROS, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILIARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RAFAEL TUBIEROS, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILIARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less