This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/29/2023 at 09:18:14 (UTC).

RADIAN DESIGN GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS MCKAY

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 RADIAN DESIGN GROUP, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MCKAY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2123

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RADIAN DESIGN GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

WEST COAST SIP GENERAL PARTNER, LLC

MCKAY, JAMES

WEST COAST SIP, LP

JOHNSTON, CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MULLEN RAY T

TRAGISH MURRAY

Defendant Attorneys

AGUILAR VIVIANO E

BRAUN CRAIG D

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Proof of Service. 5 a 1 is incomplete. Date of Service is needed.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/28/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 17

Ruling

12/19/2022: Ruling

Stipulation and Order

10/04/2022: Stipulation and Order

Stipulation and Order

08/15/2022: Stipulation and Order

Motion to Set Aside (Pre-Disposition)

10/29/2021: Motion to Set Aside (Pre-Disposition)

Case Status Conference

04/09/2021: Case Status Conference

Case Management Conference

03/10/2021: Case Management Conference

Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

12/07/2021: Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

Stipulation and Order

12/06/2021: Stipulation and Order

Answer to First Amended Complaint

11/08/2021: Answer to First Amended Complaint

Order

11/09/2021: Order

Miscellaneous Filing

11/08/2021: Miscellaneous Filing

Proof of Service

10/22/2021: Proof of Service

Reply

10/22/2021: Reply

Declaration

10/18/2021: Declaration

Opposition

10/18/2021: Opposition

Stipulation and Order

09/17/2021: Stipulation and Order

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Jury Trial; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Final Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Ruling; Result: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Stipulation and Order; Comment: Joint Stipulation to Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference and Order; GRANTED. MSC Continued to 1/5/2023 at 1:30 P.M. in Department 1.; Filed By: DEFENDANT - JOHNSTON, CHRISTOPHER|DEFENDANT - MCKAY, JAMES|DEFENDANT - WEST COAST SIP GENERAL PARTNER, LLC|DEFENDANT - WEST COAST SIP, LP|PLAINTIFF - RADIAN DESIGN GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Stipulation and Order; Comment: Joint Stipulation to Continue Final Case Management Conference and Trial, GRANTED; Filed By: DEFENDANT - JOHNSTON, CHRISTOPHER|DEFENDANT - MCKAY, JAMES|DEFENDANT - WEST COAST SIP GENERAL PARTNER, LLC|DEFENDANT - WEST COAST SIP, LP|PLAINTIFF - RADIAN DESIGN GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf; Filed By: DEFENDANT - JOHNSTON, CHRISTOPHER|DEFENDANT - MCKAY, JAMES|DEFENDANT - WEST COAST SIP GENERAL PARTNER, LLC|DEFENDANT - WEST COAST SIP, LP|PLAINTIFF - RADIAN DESIGN GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Stipulation and Order; Comment: Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial and Vacate and Re-Set MSC ORDER:Having read and considered the parties' attached Joint Stipulation, and finding good cause exists to issue the following order, the Court orders the following:1. The Final Case Management and Trial are vacated.2. The Trial date is continued to 10/31/2022 at 9:00 A.M. in Department 17.3. The MSC currently scheduled 3/4/2022 at 11:00 A.M. in Department 11 is hereby rescheduled to be reset by Court.4. The Final Case Management to be set 10/31/2022 at 9:00 A.M. in Department 17 of the above-captioned Court.5. All applicable motion and discovery deadlines are continued and correspond to the new trial date pursuant to applicable rules and procedures under california law.IT IS SO ORDERED.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RADIAN DESIGN GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order; Comment: Granting Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Entry of DefaultTherefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Defendant James McKay's Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default isgranted. Defendant James McKay shall file and serve his Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before November 15, 2021.Mr. McKay's Answer shall be deemed timely so long as it is filed and Dated: served on or before the November 15, 2021 deadline.IT IS SO ORDERED.; Filed By: DEFENDANT - MCKAY, JAMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to First Amended Complaint; Comment: as to James McKay; Filed By: DEFENDANT - MCKAY, JAMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to First Amended Complaint; Comment: by Christopher Johnston; Filed By: DEFENDANT - JOHNSTON, CHRISTOPHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: First Amended Complaint. As to West Coast SIP General Partner LLC. Sub service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RADIAN DESIGN GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: First Amended Complaint. As to West Coast SIP LP DBA West Coast SIPs. Sub service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RADIAN DESIGN GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: First Amended Complaint. As to James Mckay. Sub service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RADIAN DESIGN GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: First Amended Complaint; Comment: First Amended Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RADIAN DESIGN GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Comment: Summons on First Amended Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RADIAN DESIGN GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: CRC 3.110Hearing Date: 12/28/20Hearing Time: 8:30Hearing Department/Division: 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RADIAN DESIGN GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RADIAN DESIGN GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - RADIAN DESIGN GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGUILAR, VIVIANO E.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRAUN, CRAIG D