This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/22/2020 at 08:51:36 (UTC).

QUINTANA VS KENNON

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 QUINTANA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KENNON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2236

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

QUINTANA, ITALIA

QUINTANA, ISAAC

Defendant

KENNON, MERCEDES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDMONSTON, CRAIG A

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Both minors are over 14 years of age and should be listed as the applicant on #1, please review and correct application.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/12/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:11

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Craig Edmonston Re:Summons Reason: Please resubmit with Guardian Ad Litem application.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Both minors are over 14 years of age and should be listed as the applicant on #1, please review and correct application.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/12/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Craig Edmonston Re:Summons Reason: Please resubmit with Guardian Ad Litem application.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less