This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:46:23 (UTC).

QUINLAN LIVING TRUST

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 QUINLAN LIVING TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Lampe, David R., Seidman, David, Myers, Brett and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2196

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Lampe, David R.

Seidman, David

Myers, Brett

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioners

QUINLAN, JOHN PATRICK

QUINLAN, WILLIAM, Jr.

Not Classified By Court

QUINLAN, PAULINE ALICE

QUINLAN SR., WILLIAM MILTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

MIRAMONTES, CELIDA B

BRAUN, CRAIG N

DAKE, STEPHEN M

 

Court Documents

Compliance Hearing

(3) Petitions, Compliance Hearing08/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - Joinder Notes: 1. None of the parties or interested persons have been served with second amended petition. 08/03/2017 CALENDAR #1; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: MIRAMONTES, CELIDA B; Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Second amended petition.

Motion

3/30/17 MO: Notice of Motion and Motion to consolidate action; memorandum of: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - Notice of Motion and Motion to consolidate action; memorandum of points and authorities NOTES: 1. The motion does not list all named parties in each case, the names of those who have appeared, and the names of their respective attorneys of record, does not contain the captions of all the cases sought to be consolidated with the lowest numbered case shown first, and does not indicate that the notice of motion was filed in each case sought to be consolidated as is required under Cal Rules of Ct 3.350(a).

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Second Amended Petition

Petition

(2) Petition 03/23/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PETITION IS RENDERED MOOT BY FILING OF AMENDED PETITION - RE PETITION TO DETERMINE OWNERSHIP OF PROPERTY 03/23/17 CALENDAR #2; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: MIRAMONTES, CELIDA B; Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M

Ruling

MO Ruling re: Under submission matter of 8/18/16: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Petition

8/4/16 MO(2): Petition, Demurrer: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues; Comment: READY FOR HEARING Petition to determine ownership of property, to determine validity of purported trust, to appoint successor trustee and for order directing transfer of assets to quinlan living trust and payment of damages 8/4/16 CALENDAR #1

Petition

MO Petition: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: MIRAMONTES, CELIDA B

Petition

PETITION: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: ***MATTER NOT REVIEWED. TO BE CONTINUED IN COURT. APPEARANCE AT HEARING IS NECESSARY***; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: MIRAMONTES, CELIDA B

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: returned to Gina M. Cervantes

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 08/03/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 07/27/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BRAUN, CRAIG N

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 06/18/2018: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- CMC re: Second Amended Petition to Determine Ownership to Property, to Determine Validity of Purported Trust, to Appoint Successor Trustee and for Order Directing Transfer of Assets to Quinlan Living Trust and Payment of Damages [Probate Code Sections 17200, 850, 859]; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M

Petition

Petition 10/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING Second Amended Petition to Determine Ownership of Property, etc.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: MIRAMONTES, CELIDA B; Petitioner; Attorney: DAKE, STEPHEN M

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of filing notie of pendency of action.

Petition

MO (2) Petition and Compliance Hearing: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - PETITION TO DETERMINE OWNERSHIP OF PROPERTY, TO DETERMINE VALIDITY OF PURPORTED TRUST, TO APPOINT SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND FOR ORDER DIRECTING TRANSFER OF ASSETS TO QUINLAN LIVING TRUST AND PAYMENT OF DAMAGES NOTE - 1. Need notice of motion for joinder or amended petition per Order on William Quinlan, Jr's Demurrer filed 10/12/16. NEW NOTE- 2. William Milton Quinlan, Sr. was not served with a copy of the notice of hearing and petition 30 days prior to the date of the hearing as required under PC 851. 11/17/16 CALENDAR #1; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: MIRAMONTES, CELIDA B; Petitioner; Attorney: BRAUN, CRAIG N

Petition

**MO - Probate Public: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING Petition to determine ownership of property, to determine validity of purported trust, to appoint successor trustee and for order directing transfer of assets to quinlan living trust and payment of damages 8/18/16 CALENDAR #1; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: MIRAMONTES, CELIDA B; Petitioner; Attorney: BRAUN, CRAIG N

Petition

MO Petition to determine ownership: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - PETITION TO DETERMINE OWNERSHIP OF PROPERTY, VALIDITY OF PURPORTED TRUST, APPT SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE & FOR ORDER DIRECTING TRANSFER OF ASSETS & PAYMENT OF DAMAGES; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: MIRAMONTES, CELIDA B; Petitioner; Attorney: BRAUN, CRAIG N

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketWrit Returned and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Writ of Execution Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketLetter Received - Comment: Letter From: Attorney Dake Date of Letter: 5/10/19 Re: Writ original returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Writ...returned via attorney out basket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Write of possession of real property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Order - Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Comment: Order on Ex Parte Motion for Clarification

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Nina J. Ballentine Regarding Notice of Ex Parte Motion for Clarification

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Craig N. Braun Regarding Attempted Meet and Confer Pursuant to Code of Civl Procedure Section 430.41(a)(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - PETITION: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: ***MATTER NOT REVIEWED. TO BE CONTINUED IN COURT. APPEARANCE AT HEARING IS NECESSARY***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: Amended Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estate of Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: Notice of Hearing - Decedent's Estate or Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketProbate Documents - Requested By: QUINLAN, JOHN PATRICK; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketPetition (Initiating) - Comment: Petition to Determine ownership of property, to Determine validity of purported Trust, to appoint Successor Trustee and for order directing transfer of assets to Quinlan Living Trust and payment of damages (Probate code sections 17200, 850, 859)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Trust returned via AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: John Patrick Quinlan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: John Patrick Quinlan

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAKE, STEPHEN M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRAUN, CRAIG N

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIRAMONTES CELIDA