This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/04/2021 at 08:07:49 (UTC).

QUIJADA VS DURHAM

Case Summary

On 02/26/2020 QUIJADA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DURHAM. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1464

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUIJADA, CINDY

Defendants

DURHAM, BEAU CHANCELLOR

ALL STATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 05/26/2020: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONTINUED FROM 04/29/2020 BY STANDING ORDER

Ruling

Ruling 05/12/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Lack of Prosecution Before Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 05/26/2020: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONTINUED FROM 04/29/2020 BY STANDING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 05/12/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (SC-104)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (SC-104)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: QUIJADA, CINDY; Served: 02/27/2020; Served: 02/28/20202:50 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: SC-100

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALL STATE NORTHBROOK INDEMINITY COMPANY is a litigant