This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/05/2021 at 16:11:59 (UTC).

QUEZADA VS STATE OF CALIFORNIA, A PUBLIC ENTITY ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/09/2020 QUEZADA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STATE OF CALIFORNIA, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0934

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

QUEZADA, JOSE MIGUEL

QUEZADA

Defendants

CORRECTIONAL OFFICER J. SWANSON, AN INDIVIDUAL, IN HIS INDIVIDUAL AND OFFICIAL CAPACITIES

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION, A PUBLIC ENTITY

STATE OF CALIFORNIA, A PUBLIC ENTITY

CORRECTIONAL OFFICER R. MORALES, AN INDIVIDUAL, IN HIS INDIVIDUAL AND OFFICAL CAPACITIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCMURRAY, RANDY H

Defendant Attorney

HENNES, LUCAS L.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 8/12/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service; party served does not conform to the Complaint, Court address is incorrect, please review. As to Affidavit of Non-Service; only one party may be listed per Declaration of Non-Service, party whom attempted service was made must conform to the Complaint. Court address is missing. Please review.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: 2nd Rejection; as to Proofs of Service; Item 3a, party served does not conform to the Complaint. Item 3b, authorized person who accepted Service on behalf of the Defendant the State of California, a Public Entity via personal service is not listed. Please review. As to Affidavits/Declarations of Non-Service; Second Rejection. Party listed does not conform to the Complaint. Please review.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: 3rd Rejection; as to Proofs of Service; item 3a, party served does not conform to the Complaint. Please review.

Ruling

Ruling 07/09/2020: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 07/09/2020: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: to Adverse Party of Removal of Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, a Public Entity via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Correctional Officer R. Morales, an individual, in his individual and official capacities via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Correctional Officer J. Swanson, an individual, in his individual and official capacities via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to State of California, a public entitiy via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: 3rd Rejection; as to Proofs of Service; item 3a, party served does not conform to the Complaint. Please review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: 2nd Rejection; as to Proofs of Service; Item 3a, party served does not conform to the Complaint. Item 3b, authorized person who accepted Service on behalf of the Defendant the State of California, a Public Entity via personal service is not listed. Please review. As to Affidavits/Declarations of Non-Service; Second Rejection. Party listed does not conform to the Complaint. Please review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service; party served does not conform to the Complaint, Court address is incorrect, please review. As to Affidavit of Non-Service; only one party may be listed per Declaration of Non-Service, party whom attempted service was made must conform to the Complaint. Court address is missing. Please review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 06/12/20202:19 PM; Served: 06/08/20208:47 AM; Served: 06/30/202012:10 PM; Served: 06/30/202012:10 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 8/12/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUEZADA is a litigant

Latest cases where California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCMURRAY RANDY HUE