Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:52:02 (UTC).

PUSKARICH LIVING TRUST

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 PUSKARICH LIVING TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R. and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2194

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioners

KRUIP, DAWN LEANN

PUSKARICH, DANIEL L

PUSKARICH, PATRICIA D

Not Classified By Court

PAULINE, PUSKARICH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

STREED, SCOTT S

TEIXEIRA, J STANLEY

 

Court Documents

Accounting Initial

Accounting Initial 04/18/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Report of Trustees and Petition for Settlement and Approval of Account 04/17/2018 CALENDAR #2; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: STREED, SCOTT S; Petitioner; Attorney: TEIXEIRA, J STANLEY; Petitioner; Attorney: TEIXEIRA, J STANLEY

Accounting Initial

Accounting Initial 01/31/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: re: report of trustees and petition for settlement and approval of account (PC 17200) NOT READY FOR HEARING: SAME NOTES - 1. Need copies of the promissory notes for the loans. 2. Need copies of the rental agreements for the properties that are rented out. 3. Receipts for rental properties need to specify which property rental income is being received. 4. Need explanation by way of a verified statement as to why the trust was not distributed after Trustor's death, or on the date on which the gross estate of the Trustor was valued pursuant to IRC Section 2032, whichever is later, as is required by Article 4.02(b) of the Trust. 5. Need copies of income tax returns filed for the period of the accounting. 6. Need copies of all bank statements for every bank account referenced in the accounting. 7. Need copies of all brokerage account statements. 8. Confidential documents shall be filed under confidential cover and lodged in the confidential portion of the Court's file.

Accounting Initial

Accounting Initial 07/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING SAME NOTES - 1. Need copies of the promissory notes for the loans. 2. Need copies of the rental agreements for the properties that are rented out. 3. Receipts for rental properties need to specify which property rental income is being received. 4. Need explanation by way of a verified statement as to why the trust was not distributed after Trustor's death, or on the date on which the gross estate of the Trustor was valued pursuant to IRC Section 2032, whichever is later, as is required by Article 4.02(b) of the Trust. 5. Need copies of income tax returns filed for the period of the accounting. 6. Need copies of all bank statements for every bank account referenced in the accounting. 7. Need copies of all brokerage account statements. 8. Confidential documents shall be filed under confidential cover and lodged in the confidential portion of the Court's file.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: TEIXEIRA, J STANLEY; Petitioner; Attorney: TEIXEIRA, J STANLEY

Accounting Initial

Accounting Initial 03/29/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING SAME NOTES - 1. Need copies of the promissory notes for the loans. 2. Need copies of the rental agreements for the properties that are rented out. 3. Receipts for rental properties need to specify which property rental income is being received. 4. Need explanation by way of a verified statement as to why the trust was not distributed after Trustor's death, or on the date on which the gross estate of the Trustor was valued pursuant to IRC Section 2032, whichever is later, as is required by Article 4.02(b) of the Trust. 5. Need copies of income tax returns filed for the period of the accounting. 6. Need copies of all bank statements for every bank account referenced in the accounting. 7. Need copies of all brokerage account statements. 8. Confidential documents shall be filed under confidential cover and lodged in the confidential portion of the Court's file.

Accounting Initial

**MO - Probate Public: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING SAME NOTES - 1. Need copies of the promissory notes for the loans. 2. Need copies of the rental agreements for the properties that are rented out. 3. Receipts for rental properties need to specify which property rental income is being received. 4. Need explanation by way of a verified statement as to why the trust was not distributed after Trustor's death, or on the date on which the gross estate of the Trustor was valued pursuant to IRC Section 2032, whichever is later, as is required by Article 4.02(b) of the Trust. 5. Need copies of income tax returns filed for the period of the accounting. 6. Need copies of all bank statements for every bank account referenced in the accounting. 7. Need copies of all brokerage account statements. 8. Confidential documents shall be filed under confidential cover and lodged in the confidential portion of the Court's file.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: TEIXEIRA, J STANLEY; Petitioner; Attorney: TEIXEIRA, J STANLEY

Accounting Initial

Accounting Initial 08/31/2016: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - REPORT OF TRUSTEES AND PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT AND APPROVAL OF ACCOUNT (PC 17200) NOTES: 1. Need copies of the promissory notes for the loans. 2. Need copies of the rental agreements for the properties that are rented out. 3. Receipts for rental properties need to specify which property rental income is being received. 4. Need explanation by way of a verified statement as to why the trust was not distributed after Trustor's death, or on the date on which the gross estate of the Trustor was valued pursuant to IRC Section 2032, whichever is later, as is required by Article 4.02(b) of the Trust. 5. Need copies of income tax returns filed for the period of the accounting. 6. Need copies of all bank statements for every bank account referenced in the accounting. 7. Need copies of all brokerage account statements. 8. Confidential documents shall be filed under confidential cover and lodged in the confidential portion of the Court's file.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: STREED, SCOTT S

Petition

6/23/16 MO: Petition: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING PETITION TO COMPEL TRUSTEES DANIEL L. PUSKARICH & PATRICIA D. PUSKARICH TO ACCOUNT TO PETITIONER DAWN LEANN KRUIP; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: STREED, SCOTT S; Petitioner; Attorney: TEIXEIRA, J STANLEY; Petitioner; Attorney: TEIXEIRA, J STANLEY

Petition

MO Petition to compel: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING PETITION TO COMPEL TRUSTEES DANIEL L. PUSKARICH AND PATRICIA D. PUSKARICH TO ACCOUNT TO PETITIONER DAWN LEANN KRUIP; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: STREED, SCOTT S

Petition

PETITION: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTES: 1. Page 5 of Trust appears to be incomplete/cut-off (missing page number & refers to list of grandchildren). Need complete copy of pg 5 which includes page number at bottom. 2. Need date of death of grandson Darren Puskarich by way of verified supplement. 3. Street address of Daniel on proof of mailing does not match petition (1921 v. 1917). Was proper notice given? Need explanation/verification by way of verified supplement.; Parties Present Petitioner: KRUIP, DAWN LEANN

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Accounting Initial - Accounting Initial 04/18/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Report of Trustees and Petition for Settlement and Approval of Account 04/17/2018 CALENDAR #2; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: STREED, SCOTT S; Petitioner; Attorney: TEIXEIRA, J STANLEY; Petitioner; Attorney: TEIXEIRA, J STANLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Order to Appear - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- re: Daniel Puskarich, Patricia Puskarich and Dawn Kruip for why they should not be removed as co-trustees and why sanctions should not be imposed up to $1,500.00 pursuant to CCP 177.5 for failure to follow previous court orders. 04/17/2018 CALENDAR #1; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: STREED, SCOTT S; Petitioner; Attorney: TEIXEIRA, J STANLEY; Petitioner; Attorney: TEIXEIRA, J STANLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: With prejudice- Entire Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Accounting Initial - Accounting Initial 01/31/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: re: report of trustees and petition for settlement and approval of account (PC 17200) NOT READY FOR HEARING: SAME NOTES - 1. Need copies of the promissory notes for the loans. 2. Need copies of the rental agreements for the properties that are rented out. 3. Receipts for rental properties need to specify which property rental income is being received. 4. Need explanation by way of a verified statement as to why the trust was not distributed after Trustor's death, or on the date on which the gross estate of the Trustor was valued pursuant to IRC Section 2032, whichever is later, as is required by Article 4.02(b) of the Trust. 5. Need copies of income tax returns filed for the period of the accounting. 6. Need copies of all bank statements for every bank account referenced in the accounting. 7. Need copies of all brokerage account statements. 8. Confidential documents shall be filed under confidential cover and lodged in the confidential portion of the Court's file.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: With Prejudice- Entire Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Accounting Initial - Accounting Initial 07/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING SAME NOTES - 1. Need copies of the promissory notes for the loans. 2. Need copies of the rental agreements for the properties that are rented out. 3. Receipts for rental properties need to specify which property rental income is being received. 4. Need explanation by way of a verified statement as to why the trust was not distributed after Trustor's death, or on the date on which the gross estate of the Trustor was valued pursuant to IRC Section 2032, whichever is later, as is required by Article 4.02(b) of the Trust. 5. Need copies of income tax returns filed for the period of the accounting. 6. Need copies of all bank statements for every bank account referenced in the accounting. 7. Need copies of all brokerage account statements. 8. Confidential documents shall be filed under confidential cover and lodged in the confidential portion of the Court's file.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: TEIXEIRA, J STANLEY; Petitioner; Attorney: TEIXEIRA, J STANLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Accounting Initial - Accounting Initial 03/29/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING SAME NOTES - 1. Need copies of the promissory notes for the loans. 2. Need copies of the rental agreements for the properties that are rented out. 3. Receipts for rental properties need to specify which property rental income is being received. 4. Need explanation by way of a verified statement as to why the trust was not distributed after Trustor's death, or on the date on which the gross estate of the Trustor was valued pursuant to IRC Section 2032, whichever is later, as is required by Article 4.02(b) of the Trust. 5. Need copies of income tax returns filed for the period of the accounting. 6. Need copies of all bank statements for every bank account referenced in the accounting. 7. Need copies of all brokerage account statements. 8. Confidential documents shall be filed under confidential cover and lodged in the confidential portion of the Court's file.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Accounting Initial - **MO - Probate Public: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING SAME NOTES - 1. Need copies of the promissory notes for the loans. 2. Need copies of the rental agreements for the properties that are rented out. 3. Receipts for rental properties need to specify which property rental income is being received. 4. Need explanation by way of a verified statement as to why the trust was not distributed after Trustor's death, or on the date on which the gross estate of the Trustor was valued pursuant to IRC Section 2032, whichever is later, as is required by Article 4.02(b) of the Trust. 5. Need copies of income tax returns filed for the period of the accounting. 6. Need copies of all bank statements for every bank account referenced in the accounting. 7. Need copies of all brokerage account statements. 8. Confidential documents shall be filed under confidential cover and lodged in the confidential portion of the Court's file.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: TEIXEIRA, J STANLEY; Petitioner; Attorney: TEIXEIRA, J STANLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Accounting Initial - Accounting Initial 08/31/2016: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - REPORT OF TRUSTEES AND PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT AND APPROVAL OF ACCOUNT (PC 17200) NOTES: 1. Need copies of the promissory notes for the loans. 2. Need copies of the rental agreements for the properties that are rented out. 3. Receipts for rental properties need to specify which property rental income is being received. 4. Need explanation by way of a verified statement as to why the trust was not distributed after Trustor's death, or on the date on which the gross estate of the Trustor was valued pursuant to IRC Section 2032, whichever is later, as is required by Article 4.02(b) of the Trust. 5. Need copies of income tax returns filed for the period of the accounting. 6. Need copies of all bank statements for every bank account referenced in the accounting. 7. Need copies of all brokerage account statements. 8. Confidential documents shall be filed under confidential cover and lodged in the confidential portion of the Court's file.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: STREED, SCOTT S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition - 6/23/16 MO: Petition: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING PETITION TO COMPEL TRUSTEES DANIEL L. PUSKARICH & PATRICIA D. PUSKARICH TO ACCOUNT TO PETITIONER DAWN LEANN KRUIP; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: STREED, SCOTT S; Petitioner; Attorney: TEIXEIRA, J STANLEY; Petitioner; Attorney: TEIXEIRA, J STANLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition - MO Petition to compel: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING PETITION TO COMPEL TRUSTEES DANIEL L. PUSKARICH AND PATRICIA D. PUSKARICH TO ACCOUNT TO PETITIONER DAWN LEANN KRUIP; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: STREED, SCOTT S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • Substitution of Attorneys - Comment: Substitution of Attorneys

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • Proof of Service Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: 4/21/016 @ 9;00am in Div. P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • Supplement - Comment: Verified

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition - PETITION: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTES: 1. Page 5 of Trust appears to be incomplete/cut-off (missing page number & refers to list of grandchildren). Need complete copy of pg 5 which includes page number at bottom. 2. Need date of death of grandson Darren Puskarich by way of verified supplement. 3. Street address of Daniel on proof of mailing does not match petition (1921 v. 1917). Was proper notice given? Need explanation/verification by way of verified supplement.; Parties Present Petitioner: KRUIP, DAWN LEANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Probate Documents - Requested By: KRUIP, DAWN LEANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Petition (Initiating) - Comment: Petition to compel Trustees Daniel L Puskarich and Patricia D Puskarich to account to Petitioner Dawn Leann Kruip (Prob Code 17200, subd. (b)(7), 16062(a))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Trust returned via UPS Express

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Stanley Teixeira

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STREED SCOTT STEVEN