Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:00:53 (UTC).

PULIDO VS CRUZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 PULIDO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CRUZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1276

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PULIDO, LORENZO

Defendants

MAYRA, MONTES

ALEXANDER, LEYVA

CRUZ, AIDA

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

9/1/15 Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Dismissed; Parties Present Defendant: CRUZ, AIDA

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2015
  • Cause of Action: Plaintiff's Claim; Type: Action; Filed By: 10375; Filed Against: 103751037510375

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Req for Dism After Hearing/Trial (CS/FAM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • Dismissed Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Trial - 9/1/15 Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Dismissed; Parties Present Defendant: CRUZ, AIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: SUB SERVICE TO MAYRA MONTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: SUB SERV TO AIDA CRUZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: SUB SRV TO ALEXANDRA LEYVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: As to Lorenzo Pulido.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees - Comment: NOTICE FROM COURT TO REVISE AND REVISED REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied / Incomplete - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Cause Of Action - Action Plaintiff's Claim; File Date: 07/07/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PULIDO, LORENZO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less