Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 23:38:04 (UTC).

PUGH VS PUGH, II

Case Summary

On 08/26/2015 PUGH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PUGH, II. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dulcich, Judith K., Camacho, Marcos R. and Katz, Steven M.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0066

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dulcich, Judith K.

Camacho, Marcos R.

Katz, Steven M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PUGH, CRYSTAL

Respondent

PUGH, BOBBY D, II

 

Court Documents

Default

DEFAULT: Judicial Officer: Katz, Steven M.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

MO-OSC IN RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE: Judicial Officer: Katz, Steven M.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: PUGH, CRYSTAL; Respondent: PUGH, BOBBY D, II

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Dulcich, Judith K.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Notice Re Payment of Support - Comment: FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: ENDORSED COPY OF ORDER TO PAY WAIVED COURT FEES AND COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Default - Judicial Officer: Katz, Steven M.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: RE: FILING OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Order to Pay Waived Court Fees and Costs - 10 days - Judicial Officer: Dulcich, Judith K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Dulcich, Judith K.; Comment: DISSOLUTION DATE 03/30/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Default - DEFAULT: Judicial Officer: Katz, Steven M.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: ENDORSED COPY OF DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT FL-170

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2016
  • Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • Declaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Family Law Documents - Requested By: PUGH, CRYSTAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less