This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/29/2022 at 14:24:18 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY VS SINGH

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SINGH. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4601

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

SINGH, LOVERPEET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHWARZ MARC A

 

Court Documents

Complaint

09/26/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

09/26/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

09/28/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Statement of Classification and Location

09/26/2022: Statement of Classification and Location

Order to Show Cause

09/28/2022: Order to Show Cause

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Dept.: Bakersfield Division L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 01/11/2023Hearing Time: 8:30amHearing Department/Division: L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Statement of Classification and Location; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMAPNY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHWARZ MARC A.