This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/25/2022 at 08:57:04 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS TEJON RANCH COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TEJON RANCH COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6719

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

TEJON RANCH COMPANY

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHWARZ, MARC A

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 04/04/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: G

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Standing Order-Reassignment of civil cases from Department 12 and Division G to Division L and declaration of mailing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 04/04/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEJON RANCH CO., A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHWARZ MARC A.