This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 10/01/2022 at 09:20:25 (UTC).

PRISCILLA HERERA, INDIVIDUALLY, AND ON BEHALF OF OTHER MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC SIMILARLY SITUATED VS CENTRE FOR NEURO SKILLS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/01/2022 PRISCILLA HERERA, INDIVIDUALLY, AND ON BEHALF OF OTHER MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC SIMILARLY SITUATED filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CENTRE FOR NEURO SKILLS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1922

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRISCILLA HERRERA INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF OTHER MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendants

CENTRE FOR NEURO SKILLS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CFN SERVICES, INC. - CALIFORNIA, AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY

CFN SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIWAZIAN EDWIN

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued and Filed

08/04/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

08/01/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Complaint

08/01/2022: Complaint

Order to Show Cause

08/04/2022: Order to Show Cause

First Amended Complaint

08/05/2022: First Amended Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

08/05/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

09/21/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

09/21/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

09/21/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to CFN Services Inc.-California, an unknown business entity, via mail service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PRISCILLA HERRERA INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF OTHER MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC SIMILARLY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to CFN Services, Inc., a California corporation, via mail service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PRISCILLA HERRERA INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF OTHER MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC SIMILARLY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Centre for Neuro Skills, a California corporation, via mail; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PRISCILLA HERRERA INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF OTHER MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC SIMILARLY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Comment: First Amended Summons (Summons)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: First Amended Complaint; Comment: Amended Complaint - Amount Unchanged (No Fee) (Amendments)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 11/17/2022Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTRE FOR NUEURO SKILLS- LA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIWAZIAN EDWIN