This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:47:10 (UTC).

PRIMERO VS LOVE SUSHI USA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 PRIMERO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LOVE SUSHI USA, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0710

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PRIMERO, JONATHAN

JONATHAN PRIMERO, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARY SITUATED, AND ON BEHALF OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC

Defendants

LOVE SUSHI USA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LOVE SUSHI USA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATOFSKY, ALEX P

Defendant Attorneys

KWON, EUN J, Jr.

SONG, RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 01/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: (Parties were to attend mediation)

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 9-18-17: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: IN THE TITLE BENEATH ATTORNEY'S INFORMATION; ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF LOVE SUSHI USA. INC IS INCORRECT. THE PARTY LOVE SUSHI USA, INC. IS A DEFENDANT IN THE CASE. PLEASE CORRECT AND RESUBMIT.

Order to Show Cause

Order to Show Cause: Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 7/19/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:17

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: APPROVING SETTLEMENT OF CLAIMS AND DISMISSING ACTION The Court, having reviewed the Parties' stipulation and any and all supporting papers, hereby ORDERS that: 1. The settlement of Plaintiff's individual claims is APPROVED; and 2. The action is hereby DIMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Jonathan Primero's individual claims, and DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to the class claims and claims under PAGA asserted on behalf of all putative class members and allegedly aggrieved employees; and 3. The Court shall retain jurisdiction under Code of Civil Procedure Section 664.6 with respect to all matters related to the consummation of the settlement. IT IS SO ORDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration Of Daniel F. Gaines

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: mediation date to be set by next court date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement - Conditional - Comment: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Intent to Appear by Telephone

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: AS TO LOVE SUSHI USA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO LOVE SUSHI USA, INC, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 04/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Order to Show Cause: Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 7/19/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURN VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less