This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:48:10 (UTC).

PRIETO VS PRIETO (E)

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 PRIETO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PRIETO E. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Loo, Cynthia L., Bittleston, Dawn, Benavides, Jose R. and Foley, Therese M.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2010

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Loo, Cynthia L.

Bittleston, Dawn

Benavides, Jose R.

Foley, Therese M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PRIETO, JOSE MANUEL

Respondent

PRIETO, HEIDY NEREIDA ROCHA

Minor

COUNSEL, MINOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BOWMAN, STACY H

Respondent Attorney

CLOUD, BOBBY L

Minor Attorneys

HART, JR., CARL W

HART, CARL W, Jr.

 

Court Documents

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 05/10/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONTD FROM 7/24/18 8/23/18 10/24/18 01/24/19 3/21/19

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 03/21/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONTD FROM 7/24/18 8/23/18 10/24/18 01/24/19

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 01/24/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/17/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONTD FROM 7/24/18 8/23/18 10/24/18

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 10/24/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/17/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONTD FROM 7/24/18 8/23/18

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 08/23/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/17/2018 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONT'D FROM 7/24/18

Family Centered Case Resolution

Original Type: Family Centered Case Resolution; Family Centered Case Resolution 07/24/2018: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/17/2018 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Petitioner 09/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 06/16/17 RES ATTY F/C STRIKE EXHIBIT CONTD FROM 8/9/17; Parties Present Petitioner: PRIETO, JOSE MANUEL; Attorney: BOWMAN, STACY H; Respondent: PRIETO, HEIDY NEREIDA ROCHA; Attorney: CLOUD, BOBBY L; Minor Party; Court Appointed: HART, CARL W, Jr.

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 06/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 04/17/17 PET C/C C/V 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 5/23/17; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: BOWMAN, STACY H; Respondent; Attorney: CLOUD, BOBBY L; Minor Party; Court Appointed: HART, CARL W, Jr.

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 05/23/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 04/17/17 PET C/C C/V 2 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: PRIETO, JOSE MANUEL; Attorney: BOWMAN, STACY H; Respondent; Attorney: CLOUD, BOBBY L

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: CONTD FROM 7/24/18 8/23/18 10/24/18 01/24/19 3/21/19 5/10/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney - Comment: BOBBY L. CLOUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: END DATE: 05/31/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketDeclaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketAppearance Stipulation and Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketStipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 05/10/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONTD FROM 7/24/18 8/23/18 10/24/18 01/24/19 3/21/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 03/21/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONTD FROM 7/24/18 8/23/18 10/24/18 01/24/19

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketOrder Appointing Counsel for Minor(s) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 05/23/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 04/17/17 PET C/C C/V 2 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY FATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2017
  • DocketVoid: Entered in Error - Comment: Video 'TEST-1' completed by party on 05/14/2017 19:56:11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: IN PRO PER New Attorney:ATTORNEY BOBBY CLOUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: HRG 05/23/17 DIV E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: HRG 05/23/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less