This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/15/2023 at 05:49:05 (UTC).

PRICE VS ESTRADA

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 PRICE filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against ESTRADA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0081

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PRICE, YVONNE

Respondent

ESTRADA, NOZAREO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RABI JUSTIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Petition for Harassment; Dept.: Mojave Division B; Result: Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service by Mail (CH-250); Filed By: PETITIONER - PRICE, YVONNE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Petition for Harassment; Dept.: Mojave Division B; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Order on Request to Continue Hearing (CH-116); Filed By: PETITIONER - PRICE, YVONNE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Personal Service (CH-200); Filed By: PETITIONER - PRICE, YVONNE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Petition for Harassment; Dept.: Mojave Division A; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Order on Request to Continue Hearing (CH-116); Filed By: PETITIONER - PRICE, YVONNE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Petition for Harassment; Dept.: Mojave Division B; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Order on Request to Continue Hearing (CH-116); Filed By: PETITIONER - PRICE, YVONNE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Temporary Restraining Order (CH-110); Comment: GRANTED; Filed By: PETITIONER - PRICE, YVONNE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Court Hearing (CH-109); Filed By: PETITIONER - PRICE, YVONNE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted; Filed By: PETITIONER - PRICE, YVONNE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed By: PETITIONER - PRICE, YVONNE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (CH-100); Filed By: PETITIONER - PRICE, YVONNE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less