This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/04/2020 at 11:47:11 (UTC).

PRICE, Jr. VS PRICE(B)

Case Summary

On 10/03/2018 PRICE, Jr filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PRICE B. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cannon, Gloria, Bittleston, Dawn, Robertson, Murray J. and Diesman, Kathleen O.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4132

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cannon, Gloria

Bittleston, Dawn

Robertson, Murray J.

Diesman, Kathleen O.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PRICE, RONALD R, Jr.

Respondent

PRICE, JEANETTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ETCHEVERRY-BARNES, PAIGE M

Respondent Attorney

GORSKI, VINCENT A.

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 11/07/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 10/4/18 PET C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 1MINOR; Parties Present Petitioner: PRICE, RONALD R, Jr.; Attorney: ETCHEVERRY-BARNES, PAIGE M; Respondent: PRICE, JEANETTA

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 11/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 10/4/18 PET C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 1MINOR CONT FROM 11/07/2018; Parties Present Petitioner: PRICE, RONALD R, Jr.; Attorney: ETCHEVERRY-BARNES, PAIGE M

Motion (DCSS)

Motion (DCSS) 04/11/2019: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: DCSS NOM C/S H/C STND ORDERS, INTERVENE 1 MINOR

Motion (DCSS)

Motion (DCSS) 05/15/2019: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: DCSS NOM CS HC STND ORDS INTERVENE 1 MINOR CONT'D FROM 4/11/19; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: ETCHEVERRY-BARNES, PAIGE M; Respondent; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A.

Motion (DCSS)

Motion (DCSS) 07/01/2019: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: DCSS NOM CS HC STND ORDS INTERVENE 1 MINOR CONT'D FROM 4/11/19, 5/15/19; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A.

Motion (DCSS)

Motion (DCSS) 08/14/2019: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: DCSS NOM CS HC STND ORDS INTERVENE 1 MINOR CONT'D FROM 4/11/19, 5/15/19, 7/01/19; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: ETCHEVERRY-BARNES, PAIGE M

Motion (DCSS)

Motion (DCSS) 09/09/2019: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 3/12/19 RE: CS HC STND ORDS INTERVENE - 1 MINOR CONT'D FROM 4/11/19, 5/15/19, 7/01/19, 8/14/19 *ALSO ON DIV B CAL*

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 09/09/2019: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 07/26/19 PET MOD C/C C/V ATTY F/C STMNT OF DEC 1 MINOR *ALSO ON DCSS CAL*; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A.

Motion (DCSS)

Motion (DCSS) 11/18/2019: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 3/12/19 RE: CS HC STND ORDS INTERVENE - 1 MINOR CONT'D FROM 4/11/19, 5/15/19, 7/01/19, 8/14/19, 9/9/19 *ALSO ON DIV B CAL*

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 11/18/2019: Judicial Officer: Diesman, Kathleen O.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 07/26/19 PET MOD C/C C/V ATTY F/C STMNT OF DEC 1 MINOR *ALSO ON DCSS CAL* CON FROM 9/9/19

Motion (DCSS)

Motion (DCSS) 02/10/2020: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 3/12/19 RE: C/S H/C STND ORDS INTERVEN-1 MINOR CONT'D FROM 4/11/19, 5/15/19, 7/1/19, 8/14/19, 9/9/19 & 11/18/19 ALSO IN DIV B

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 02/10/2020: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 07/26/19 PET MOD C/C C/V ATTY F/C STMNT OF DEC 1 MINOR *ALSO ON DCSS CAL* CONT FROM 9/9/19 11/18/19

Ruling

Ruling 03/25/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 03/26/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 07/26/19 PET MOD C/C C/V ATTY F/C STMNT OF DEC 1 MINOR *ALSO ON DCSS CAL* CONT FROM 9/9/19 11/18/19 02/10/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketMotion (DCSS) - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Comment: 3/12/19 RE: C/S H/C STND ORDS INTERVEN-1 MINOR CONT'D FROM 4/11/19, 5/15/19, 7/1/19, 8/14/19, 9/9/19 & 11/18/19, 02/10/20 ALSO IN DIV B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 03/26/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 03/25/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 02/10/2020: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 07/26/19 PET MOD C/C C/V ATTY F/C STMNT OF DEC 1 MINOR *ALSO ON DCSS CAL* CONT FROM 9/9/19 11/18/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion (DCSS) - Motion (DCSS) 02/10/2020: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 3/12/19 RE: C/S H/C STND ORDS INTERVEN-1 MINOR CONT'D FROM 4/11/19, 5/15/19, 7/1/19, 8/14/19, 9/9/19 & 11/18/19 ALSO IN DIV B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 11/18/2019: Judicial Officer: Diesman, Kathleen O.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 07/26/19 PET MOD C/C C/V ATTY F/C STMNT OF DEC 1 MINOR *ALSO ON DCSS CAL* CON FROM 9/9/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion (DCSS) - Motion (DCSS) 11/18/2019: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 3/12/19 RE: CS HC STND ORDS INTERVENE - 1 MINOR CONT'D FROM 4/11/19, 5/15/19, 7/01/19, 8/14/19, 9/9/19 *ALSO ON DIV B CAL*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 09/09/2019: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 07/26/19 PET MOD C/C C/V ATTY F/C STMNT OF DEC 1 MINOR *ALSO ON DCSS CAL*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion (DCSS) - Motion (DCSS) 09/09/2019: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 3/12/19 RE: CS HC STND ORDS INTERVENE - 1 MINOR CONT'D FROM 4/11/19, 5/15/19, 7/01/19, 8/14/19 *ALSO ON DIV B CAL*

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: PRO PER New Attorney:VINCENT GORSKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Comment: FROM HRG 11/15/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketResponse - Comment: E-FILED: Response to Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 11/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 10/4/18 PET C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 1MINOR CONT FROM 11/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 11/07/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 10/4/18 PET C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 1MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY FATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ETCHEVERRY-BARNES, PAIGE M