This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:55:40 (UTC).

PRICE APIARIES, INC VS KOONER ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 PRICE APIARIES, INC filed an Other lawsuit against KOONER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1146

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRICE APIARIES, INC

Defendants

NEBRASKA STATE BANK

PAWAN S. KOONER FARMS

KOONER, PAWAN S

KOONER, NAZAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARTIDA, GUILLERMO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Dismissal without Prejudice as to the Complaint/Entire Action, filed by Guillermo E Partida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: OSC Hearing Date: 11/2/15 Hearing Time: 830 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY GUILLERMO E. PARTIDA CMC: 1/19/16 @ 830 AM D12

    Read MoreRead Less