Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 08:46:15 (UTC).

PRESTIGE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC VS GEIGER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/21/2013 PRESTIGE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GEIGER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7231

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRESTIGE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC

Defendant

GEIGER, ERIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NAGEL, AUSTIN P

Attorney at LAW OFC AUSTIN P NAGEL

111 Deerwood Rd #388

San Ramon, CA 94583

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2015
  • DocketWrit Returned Partially Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Original Type: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • Docket115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for PRESTIGE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC (PL-1). Received from LAW OFFICES OF AUSTIN P. NAGEL, check no(s) 10599. Receipt #788241 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: KERN/RETURNED ORIGINAL VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketMemo of Costs / Accrued Interest - Comment: RETURNED ENDORSED COPY VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF ACCURED INTEREST AFTER JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: RE: PROOF OF SERVICE RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: FILED BY AUSTIN P. NAGEL, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED ~ calid=2418667 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4156, CourtDate:11/20/2014, Courtroom:AL, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:2, SessionType:CCM, Judge:GRW, SystemDate:11/27/2013 10:47:20 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Comment: TOTAL $11,605.02 AS TO ERIC GEIGER SIGNED BY JUDGE CRAIG PHILLIP 3/28/14

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2014
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: AS TO ERIC GEIGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: BY PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO ERIC GEIGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference - Comment: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO EACH PARTY AND THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY THE HONORABLE GARY R WITT, ON Nov 20, 2014 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL, OF THIS SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF KERN. APPEARANCE BY THE ATTORNEY RESPONSIBLE FOR THE TRIAL OF THIS ACTION IS MANDATORY. NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: You are required to serve this Notice of Case Management Conference date with the service of the Summons, Complaint (Local Rule 3.7(a)), Civil Mediation Information Brochure, and ADR Stipulation and Order Form. [CRC, Rule 3.221] NOTICE TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: If you are bringing a cross complaint against new parties, you are, likewise, required to serve this Notice of Case Management Conference date on the new cross defendants. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO EACH PARTY AND THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY THE HONORABLE GARY R WITT, ON Nov 20, 2014 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL, OF THIS SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF KERN. APPEARANCE BY THE ATTORNEY RESPONSIBLE FOR THE TRIAL OF THIS ACTION IS MANDATORY. NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: You are required to serve this Notice of Case Management Conference date with the service of the Summons, Complaint (Local Rule 3.7(a)), Civil Mediation Information Brochure, and ADR Stipulation and Order Form. [CRC, Rule 3.221] NOTICE TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: If you are bringing a cross complaint against new parties, you are, likewise, required to serve this Notice of Case Management Conference date on the new cross defendants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON May 15, 2014 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT_AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON May 15, 2014 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT_AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • Docket843Y Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) - Comment: Amount of $225.00 for PRESTIGE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC (PL-1). Received from PRESTIGE FINANCIAL SERVICES, check no(s) 258922. Receipt #750819 for amount of $225.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2013
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2013
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: DECLARATION OF AUSTIN P. NAGEL REGARDING VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2013
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRESTIGE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAGEL AUSTIN P.