This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 07:28:42 (UTC).

PREFERRED TOWING SERVICE VS TREJO, ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 PREFERRED TOWING SERVICE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TREJO,. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0001

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PREFERRED TOWING SERVICE

Defendants

Trejo, Melinda

Kacir, John

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

01/05/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

Proof of Service (SC-104)

01/20/2021: Proof of Service (SC-104)

Proof of Service (SC-104)

01/20/2021: Proof of Service (SC-104)

Electronic Rejection Notice

01/20/2021: Electronic Rejection Notice

Brief

02/10/2021: Brief

Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

02/19/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

Rejection/Correction Notice

03/09/2021: Rejection/Correction Notice

Motion to Vacate

03/18/2021: Motion to Vacate

Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

04/27/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

Small Claims Trial

02/18/2021: Small Claims Trial

Motion to Vacate (Post-Disposition)

04/22/2021: Motion to Vacate (Post-Disposition)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties; Comment: (Small Claims); Filed By: DEFENDANT - KACIR, JOHN|DEFENDANT - TREJO, MELINDA|PLAINTIFF - PREFERRED TOWING SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion to Vacate (Post-Disposition); Dept.: Mojave Division B; Result: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Motion to Vacate; Filed By: DEFENDANT - TREJO, MELINDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Rejection/Correction Notice; Comment: NOTICE OF MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT; Filed By: DEFENDANT - TREJO, MELINDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties; Comment: (Small Claims); Filed By: DEFENDANT - KACIR, JOHN|DEFENDANT - TREJO, MELINDA|PLAINTIFF - PREFERRED TOWING SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Small Claims Trial; Dept.: Mojave Division B; Result: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Brief; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PREFERRED TOWING SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE CLAIM; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PREFERRED TOWING SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service (SC-104); Comment: for John Kacir; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PREFERRED TOWING SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service (SC-104); Comment: for Melinda Trejo; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PREFERRED TOWING SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant; Comment: Emailed to service@preferredtow.com; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PREFERRED TOWING SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less