This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/28/2022 at 08:48:53 (UTC).

PRECISION PSYCHIATRIC SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS AURORA BEHAVIORAL HEALTHCARE-SANTA ROSA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/12/2022 PRECISION PSYCHIATRIC SERVICES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AURORA BEHAVIORAL HEALTHCARE-SANTA ROSA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2378

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRECISION PSYCHIATRIC SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

AURORA BEHAVIORAL HEALTHCARE-SANTA ROSA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAUN CRAIG D

 

Court Documents

Complaint

09/12/2022: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

09/14/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

09/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Order to Show Cause

09/14/2022: Order to Show Cause

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

09/22/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Certificate of Progress

10/20/2022: Certificate of Progress

Ruling/Certificate of Inability

10/26/2022: Ruling/Certificate of Inability

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Ruling/Certificate of Inability; Comment: Extension granted. Responsive pleading to be filed no later than 12/19/2022.; Filed By: DEFENDANT - AURORA BEHAVIORAL HEALTHCARE-SANTA ROSA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Certificate of Progress; Filed By: DEFENDANT - AURORA BEHAVIORAL HEALTHCARE-SANTA ROSA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Aurora Behavioral Healthcare-Santa Rosa, LLC, a California limited liability company, via personal service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PRECISION PSYCHIATRIC SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 12/28/2022Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PRECISION PSYCHIATRIC SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PRECISION PSYCHIATRIC SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PRECISION PSYCHIATRIC SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRAUN, CRAIG D