This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 05:51:51 (UTC).

PRAETORIAN INSURANCE VS PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC

Case Summary

On 08/14/2014 PRAETORIAN INSURANCE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PACIFIC GAS ELECTRIC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Brumfield, Lorna H. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2747

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY

HORIZON NUT, LLC

Defendant

PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KRUEGER, KERRY

Attorney at KROLOFF, BELCHER, SMART, PERRY & CHRISTOPHERSON

7540 Shoreline Drive

Stockton, CA 95219

KRUEGER, KERRY L

Defendant Attorneys

GOUGH, GAYLE L

HANCOCK, MARK J.

 

Court Documents

Motion for Leave

**MO w/Declaration of Mailing MOTION FOR LEAVE MO: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 5/23/16 Plaintiffs, PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY and HORIZON NUT, LLC Motion for Order Granting Leave to Amend the First Amended Complaint ResID: 16081 Transferred to Department 17 for hearing only. Department 4 is dark.; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KRUEGER, KERRY L; Plaintiff; Attorney: KRUEGER, KERRY L

Ruling

07/01/16 MO: Ruling on MSJ/MSAI (heard 05/10/16) & submitted on 05/13/16.: Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Result: Ruling; Comment: Ruling on Motion for Summary Judgement/Adjudication (heard 05/10/16)

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 5/27/16: Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Result: Department Transfer

Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication

05/10/16 MO: Application to file under seal; Motion for Summary Judgment: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 3/18/16 Defendant, PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative Summary, Adjudication ResID: 14113 ***************************************************** NO TENTATIVE. READY FOR HEARING. ****************************************************; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KRUEGER, KERRY L; Defendant; Attorney: GOUGH, GAYLE L; Plaintiff; Attorney: KRUEGER, KERRY L

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

03/07/16 - MO - Ex Parte Application - Defendants: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Application for an Order Shortening Notice on Defendant Pacific Gas and Electric Company's Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to The Stipulation of the Parties

Further Case Management Conference

8/11/15 Further CMC: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT'D FROM 2/10/2015; 4/13/2015

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: T/E 15 DAYS TD 6/13/2016 (JURY REQUESTED BY ALL PARTIES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: T/E 15 DAYS (JURY REQUESTED BY ALL PARTIES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: T/E 15 DAYS FCMC 6/3/16 TD 6/13/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry - Comment: Notice of Entry of Amended Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • DocketJudgment - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: Amended judgment by court under code of civil procedure section 437c.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs and Credits - Comment: PG&E's Memorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry - Comment: Notice of Entry of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry - Comment: Notice of Entry of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Summary Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY; No Judgment Awarded; Awarded Against: PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY; HORIZON NUT, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2014
  • DocketPoints and Authorities - Comment: IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • DocketNotice of Hearing/Demurrer - Comment: DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY'S NOTCE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT 12/2/14 830AM D-4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE FILED 9/4/2014. ~ calid=2636656 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4159, CourtDate:12/03/2014, Courtroom:4, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:SPC, SystemDate:8/18/2014 3:13:53 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Dec 03, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Dec 03, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • Docket800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY (PL-1). Received from KROLOFF, BELCHER, SMART, PERRY, check no(s) 137146. Receipt #794212 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY KERRY KRUEGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: FILED BY KERRY KRUEGER CMC SET 2/10/15 @8:00AM DEPT 4

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.