Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:21:16 (UTC).

POWELL VS HICKS

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 POWELL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HICKS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0965

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POWELL, PAUL W

Defendant

HICKS, FREDDIE

 

Court Documents

Demurrer

MO-Demurrer: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: by Defendant to Complaint for Unlawful Detainer by Plaintiff; Parties Present Plaintiff: POWELL, PAUL W; Defendant: HICKS, FREDDIE

Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

Minute Order- UD Order to Show Cause 10/21/15: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Lack of Prosecution Before Trial; Unlawful Detainer:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • Order Dismissing Action (Full) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • Dismissed Without Prejudice - Comment: pursuant to local rule 3.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Minute Order- UD Order to Show Cause 10/21/15: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Demurrer - MO-Demurrer: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: by Defendant to Complaint for Unlawful Detainer by Plaintiff; Parties Present Plaintiff: POWELL, PAUL W; Defendant: HICKS, FREDDIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • Notice - Comment: of Response and Opposition to Demurrer by Defendants to Complaint for Unlawful Detainer by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Notice of Hearing/Demurrer - Comment: Hearing Date: 8/19/15 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Returned via mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Shriver Case - Mediation Offered But Not Accepted By Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Freddie Hicks.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: POWELL, PAUL W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 511 K Street, Apt B Bakersfield, CA 93304

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: Counter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment: In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less