This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:31:44 (UTC).

POWELL ET AL VS BADGER DAYLIGHTING CORP., AN INDIANA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/13/2015 POWELL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BADGER DAYLIGHTING CORP , AN INDIANA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1202

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TODD POWELL, AS A PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL ACT REPRESENTATIVE OF SIMILARLY AGGRIEVED INDIVIDUALS IN THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

POWELL, TODD

Defendant

BADGER DAYLIGHTING CORP., AN INDIANA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LE CLERCQ, JEAN-PAUL

Defendant Attorney

BATHAEE, SADAF

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Yesenia Gallegos Document: Answer to Second Amended Complaint Name of defendant does not conform to the complaint in its entirety. If defendant was erroneously sued please note that within your response.

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 11/22/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: (cont'd from 07/14/17); Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: BATHAEE, SADAF

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 07/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: BATHAEE, SADAF

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 05/10/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: LE CLERCQ, JEAN-PAUL; Plaintiff; Attorney: LE CLERCQ, JEAN-PAUL; Defendant; Attorney: BATHAEE, SADAF

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: 2nd Rejection. Please include $20.00 fee to file Stipulation.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Fees Missing

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: The date of the Case Management Conference is incorrect

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: TO: YESENIA GALLEGOS RE: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT REASON: DOCUMENT REFLECTS INCORRECT HEARING DATE

Further Case Management Conference

08/03/16 - M.O. FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont'd from 06/13/2016; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: BATHAEE, SADAF

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; DESIGNATED AREA FOR THE JUDICAL OFFICER'S SIGNATURE REQUIRED. MISSING $20 FEE.

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 03/28/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: (Case Reported Settled at last Further CMC - Plaintiff was to file Motion for Preliminary Approval); Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: BATHAEE, SADAF

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice:

Motion (Pre-Disposition)

Motion (Pre-Disposition) 01/31/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/8/2018 PLAINTIFF TODD POWELL, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS A PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL ACT REPRESENTATIVE OF SIMILARLY AGGRIEVED INDIVIDUALS IN THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 02/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONT'D FROM 11/02/16; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: BATHAEE, SADAF

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 11/02/2016: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: LE CLERCQ, JEAN-PAUL; Plaintiff; Attorney: LE CLERCQ, JEAN-PAUL; Defendant; Attorney: BATHAEE, SADAF

Ruling

**MO w/Declaration of Mailing: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

06/13/2016 Minute Order: Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont'd from 4/11/2016

Case Management Conference

04/11/2016 Minute Order: Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: LE CLERCQ, JEAN-PAUL; Plaintiff; Attorney: LE CLERCQ, JEAN-PAUL; Defendant; Attorney: BATHAEE, SADAF

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Summary Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Order Granting Motion - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVE ENHANCEMENT AWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Motion for Fees - Pre-Disposition (CL/CV) - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 7/18/18 Plaintiff Motion for an Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs and Class Representative Enhancement Award

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Approval Hearing on Class Action Settlement - Final Approval Hearing on Class Action Settlement 07/30/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 7/12/18 Plaintiff Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Notice - Comment: Revised Plaintiff's Notice of Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs and Class Representative Enhancement Award Hearing Date: 7/30/18 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Motion for Fees - Date listed on paperwork is in the past. No Notice of Hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration of Gene Williams in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs and Class Representative Enhancement Award

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration of Andrei Larion on Behalf of CPT Group, Inc., with Respect to Notification and Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Notice of Motion - Comment: Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Hearing Date: 7/30/18 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Notice of Motion - Comment: **Not Calendared** Plaintiff's Motion for An Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs and Class Representative Enhancement Award

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2016
  • Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • Answer to First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/26/16 Hearing Time: 830 AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY JEAN-PAUL LE CLERCQ, ESQ CMC 4/11/16 @ 830AM D11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Envelope Details | | B - \ Page 1 of 2 Print this page

Case # BCV-15- 101202 POWELL ET AL VS BADGER DAYLIGHTING CORP., AN INDIANA CORPORATION a (Lampe, David R)

~ [Case Informafion _;,,,H,_,.,__,- ]

Locatlon ‘. o Kem Bakersfield-Civil DateFiled = f1/31/2018 1:23 PM Case Number 'f_f . :BCV-15-101202 - POWELL ET AL VS BADGER DAYLIGHTING CORP., AN . !INDIANA CORPORATION A351gned to Judge Lampe David R.

Case Descrlptlon "

Attorney Yesema Gallegos §F irm Name” - | ;Flrst Legal Network Filed By _ INikki Perreira

Convenlence F ee : ‘, B .. s $0.25 Total Court Case Fees 180.00 Total Court Party Fees 0.0 Total Court Filing Fees 1$0.00 | lTotal Court Service Fees ~:$0.00 Total Fllmg & Serv1ce Fees ‘$5.00 Total Provider Serv1ce F ees l £$0.00 Total Provider Tax Fees " 1$0.00

Total Taxes (for non-court o $0 00 fees) |

Grand Total. $5 25

Payment “ ] Account Name E Check NEW

sTransactlon Amount B 1$440.25

Transactlon Response TransactionID_ 11841807

Order# 10011804780

Answer to Second Amended Complalnntw :Wwww o jwi; ;: : ; ,.,. m:_‘__:jm:;__] Flhng Type e A‘im”w:u"EFlle

‘Fllmg Code e | Answer to Second Amended Complaint Fllmg Descnptlon e zAnswer to Second Amended Complaint Refeence Number 3379038

https://california.tylerhost.net/EnvelopeDetails.aspx?envelopeguid=d3fde62a-8149-423a-a... 1/31/2018