This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:17:51 (UTC).

POURROY VS STURGEON SERVICES INTERNATIONAL

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 POURROY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STURGEON SERVICES INTERNATIONAL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9002

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POURROY, KOURTNEY

Defendants

STURGEON SERVICES INTERNATIONAL

STURGEON & SONS

YODER, JOSH

YODER, JOSHUA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDMONSTON, CRAIG A

Attorney at LAW OFC CRAIG A EDMONSTON

2204 Truxtun Ave

Bakersfield, CA 93301

Defendant Attorney

SIEPLER, JAMES E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2014
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: WHY MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO C.R.C 3.1385 WHY MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO C.R.C 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • Court Trial - Original Type: Court Trial; Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: DISMISSAL FILED 10/15/2014 ~ calid=2674527 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4170, CourtDate:11/19/2014, Courtroom:17, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:11, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LHB, SystemDate:10/1/2014 9:23:46 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES FILED BY CRAIG A. EDMONSTON, ESQ., COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF, KORTNEY POURROY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • NP1821 - Comment: Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED 9/29/14 BY CRAIG A EDMONSTON, ESQ *************************************************************************************** THE COURT ACKNOWLEDGES UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE. COUNSEL TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT AND DISMISS ACTION BY 11/18/14. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT 3.1385 TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ENTIRE MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED IS SET FOR 11/19/14 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 17 UNLESS DISMISSAL IS FILED PRIOR TO HEARING ALL HEARINGS ARE VACATED WITH THE EXCEPTION OF MOTIONS (IF ANY). FILING PARTY IS TO FILE A LETTER REQUESTING MOTION(S) VACATED A COPY OF THIS MINUTE ORDER TO ALL PARTIES AS STATED ON THE ATTACHED DECLARATION OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ~ calid=2389836 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4143, CourtDate:10/20/2014, Courtroom:17, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:7, SessionType:CTC, Judge:LHB, SystemDate:10/25/2013 9:42:58 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • Notice of Settlement Unconditional - Comment: FILED BY CRAIG A EDMONSTON, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Original Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: JT/FCMC 10/20/14 (DEPT 17) T/E 5 DAYS JT/FCMC 10/20/14 (DEPT 17) T/E 5 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: PURSUANT TO STIP & ORDER SIGNED 9/8/2014 ~ calid=2399706 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4007, CourtDate:09/19/2014, Courtroom:11, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:8, SessionType:STL, Judge:DRL, SystemDate:11/6/2013 9:11:06 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Stipulation and Order - Comment: FOR MEDIATION IN LIEU OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE *****L H BRUMFIELD*****

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2013
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO STURGEON & SONS SUB SERVED 5/30/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO STURGEON SERVICES INTERNATIONAL SUB SERVED 5/30/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2013
  • Answer to Complaint - Comment: ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: RETURNED PROOF OF SERVICE- DATE AND TIME OF SERVICE NOT PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • 800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for POURROY, KOURTNEY (PL-1). Received from LAW OFFICE OF CRAIG A. EDMONST, check no(s) 09927. Receipt #709626 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 12, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 12, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED BY ROYAL ATTORNEY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 686

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Complaint - Fast Track - Comment: FILED BY CRAIG A. EDMOSTON, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY CRAIG A EDMOSTON, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less