This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/03/2020 at 11:31:29 (UTC).

PORTILLO VS SALIN

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 PORTILLO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SALIN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0005

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTILLO, SONYA

Defendant

SALIN, EUGINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAY, DAVID C

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: David Shay Re: Summons Reason:Please resubmit the Summons, it does not conform to the Complaint in regards to the Defendant, please revise. Thank you

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/16/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:11

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: David Shay Re: Summons Reason:Please resubmit the Summons, it does not conform to the Complaint in regards to the Defendant, please revise. Thank you

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/16/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:11

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: ***Continued from 04/16/2020 by Standing Order. ***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: David Shay Re: Summons Reason:Please resubmit the Summons, it does not conform to the Complaint in regards to the Defendant, please revise. Thank you

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/16/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.