This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/15/2022 at 07:23:48 (UTC).

PORTILLO VS COE ORCHARD EQUIPMENT, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 PORTILLO filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against COE ORCHARD EQUIPMENT, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2182

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTILLO, EDGAR

Defendants

COE ORCHARD EQUIPMENT, INC.

THE WONDERFUL COMPANY, LLC

WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS, LLC

WONDERFUL ORCHARDS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROWLEY, NICHOLAS CHARLES

FOCIL, AUGUSTO, Jr.

Defendant Attorney

SCHRADER, DANIEL P

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/03/22 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 10

Ruling

Ruling 11/09/2021: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: re: Continuance

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint - Comment: DOE 1 named as WONDERFUL ORCHARDS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to Defendants, The Wonderful Company, LLC and Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds, LLC - Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 11/09/2021: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: re: Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to COE Orchard Equipment, Inc. via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds, LLC via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/21/20219:39 AM; Unserved; Served: 09/28/202112:27 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/03/22 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WONDERFUL ORCHARDS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where THE WONDERFUL COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHRADER DANIEL PAUL