This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/07/2021 at 07:56:57 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO V. GARIBAY

Case Summary

On 03/18/2013 PORTFOLIO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GARIBAY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3676

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

GARIBAY, GUSTAVO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGH, ANITA HARRIS

151 Bernal Rd #8

San Jose, CA 95119-1306

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2015
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6 - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • Docket115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (PL-1). Received from PLAINTIFF, check no(s) 4181611. Receipt #779535 for amount of $25.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • Docket117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (PL-1). Received from PLAINTIFF, check no(s) 395992. Receipt #725297 for amount of $25.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: OSC ON 3/14/2014 VACATED ~ calid=2195502 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4184, CourtDate:03/14/2014, Courtroom:AD, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:2, SessionType:OSC, Judge:RST, Deputy:soniah, SystemDate:3/19/2013 10:37:23 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Vacated - Default Judgment Entered - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2013
  • DocketNotification Letter Mailed - Comment: OSC RE JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 14, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 14, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • DocketNotification Letter Mailed - Comment: OSC RE SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 13, 2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 13, 2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • Docket843Y Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) - Comment: Amount of $225.00 for PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (PL-1). Received from PLAINTIFF, check no(s) 358218. Receipt #707569 for amount of $225.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 556

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUNT & HENRIQUES - ANITA H. SINGH