This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/11/2023 at 01:13:44 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS MATA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/08/2013 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MATA,. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7135

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

MATA, CELERINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRINKERHOFF KRISTEN LEIGH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/09/2015

DocketFile Type: Writ Returned Unsatisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6; Comment: Document Image

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/21/2014

DocketFile Type: 115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09; Comment: Amount of $25.00 for PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (PL-1). Received from PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, check no(s) 483579. Receipt #779393 for amount of $25.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/21/2014

DocketFile Type: Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: LOS ANGELES/RETURNED ORIGINAL VIA SASE; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2013

DocketFile Type: Judgment by Default by Clerk; Comment: TOTAL $6,954.16 AS TO CELERINA MATA.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2013

DocketFile Type: Supplemental Declaration; Comment: IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT. WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2013

DocketFile Type: Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered; Comment: AS TO CELERINA MATA.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2013

DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Partial); Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DOES 1 TO 25 ONLYL.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2013

DocketFile Type: Hearing Vacated; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ~ calid=2291190Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4183, CourtDate:01/02/2014, Courtroom:AL, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:GRW, Deputy:elenaa, SystemDate:7/9/2013 10:23:09 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2013

DocketFile Type: Proof of Service of Summons; Comment: WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) PACKET, NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSEWHO SERVED: CELERINA MATAHOW SERVED: SUBSTITUTED SERVICE, BY SERVING JUAN PARRADATE SERVED: 07/23/13; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2013

DocketFile Type: Declaration of Due Diligence Filed; Comment: Document Image; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2013

DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: OF MAILING; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2013

DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f); Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f)TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL:YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 03, 2014 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f)TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL:YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 03, 2014 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2013

DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d); Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d)TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL:YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jan 02, 2014 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d)TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL:YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jan 02, 2014 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2013

DocketFile Type: 843Y Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B); Comment: Amount of $225.00 for PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (PL-1). Received from ABC LEGAL SERVICES, INC., check no(s) 00945151. Receipt #726962 for amount of $225.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2013

DocketFile Type: CONV; Comment: New case created by deputy: 776

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2013

DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Comment: Document Image; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2013

DocketFile Type: Complaint; Comment: Document Image; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2013

DocketFile Type: Statement; Comment: OF CLASSIFICATION AND LOCATION; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2013

DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Comment: Document Image; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less