This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 10:55:04 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS HENSLER

Case Summary

On 12/12/2016 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HENSLER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0665

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

HENSLER, MARK W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSEN, DEVIN B.

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT PACKET ADDRESSING MONEY

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES; Awarded Against: HENSLER, MARK W; Amount; Damages: $1,494.98; Costs: $282.50; Total: $1777.48; Party: Names: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES; HENSLER, MARK W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA MAIL TO HUNT & HENRIQUES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Judgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Declaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE SECTION 1788.60(B)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: AGAINST MARK W HENSLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT PACKET ADDRESSING MONEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: DEFAULT PACKET ADDRESSING MONEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.