Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/25/2020 at 17:29:43 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS GUERRA, SR & GUERRA

Case Summary

On 03/28/2012 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GUERRA, SR GUERRA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6828

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendants

GUERRA, JOSE LUIS, Sr.

GUERRA, YOLANDA C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUNDQUIST, ANDREW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: CALENDARED FOR TRACKING PURPOSES ONLY. CODITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED ON 06/11/12 CALENDARED FOR TRACKING PURPOSES ONLY. CODITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED ON 06/11/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: DISMISSAL FILED ~ calid=1945912 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4003, CourtDate:04/03/2014, Courtroom:AL, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:4, SessionType:OSC, Judge:GRW, SystemDate:6/11/2012 10:27:14 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • DocketReturned After Conditional Settlement - Comment: DY165556 Post Conversion Addition for Reporting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIESAND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • DocketNotice - Comment: OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: WHAT SERVED: NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL WHO SERVED: JOSE LUIS GUERRA SR. HOW SERVED: BY MAIL DATE SERVED: 05/10/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2013
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: RE: DISMISSAL RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • DocketDismisssal Not Entered as Requested for the Following - Comment: WITHOU PREJUDICE COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION INACCORDANCE WITH CCP 664.6 AND VACATE DISMISSAL UPON NOTICE BY PLAINTIF OF BREACH OF OUTO OF COURT SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2012
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: RE: PROOF OF SERVICE RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED ~ calid=1878505 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4184, CourtDate:04/04/2013, Courtroom:AL, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:2, SessionType:OSC, Judge:GRW, Deputy:amandaa, SystemDate:3/28/2012 10:43:33 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2012
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) PACKET, STATEMENT OF CLASSIFICATION AND LOCATION, DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REDUCED FILING FEE [BUS AND PROF CODE 6322.1(C)(1)] WHO SERVED: JOSE LUIS GUERRA SR. HOW SERVED: PERSONAL SERVICE DATE SERVED: 4/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) PACKET, STATEMENT OF CLASSIFICATION AND LOCATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REDUCED FILING FEE [BUS AND PROF CODE 6322.1(C) WHO SERVED: YOLANDA C GUERRA HOW SERVED: PERSONAL SERVICE DATE SERVED: 4/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Apr 04, 2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Apr 04, 2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 04, 2012 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 04, 2012 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • DocketComplaint - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • DocketAffidavit - Comment: OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: IN SUPPORT OF REDUCED FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • Docket843X Pmt: Small Claims First Paper File by Assignee w/in SC - Comment: Amount of $181.00 for PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (PL-1). Received from ABC LEGAL SERVICES INC, check no(s) 210454. Receipt #646502 for amount of $181.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 431

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUNDQUIST ANDREW P.