This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 01:40:41 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES V TAMAYO

Case Summary

On 06/18/2014 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TAMAYO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4222

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

TAMAYO, DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COOK, JORDAN D

Attorney at PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: OSC VACATED. ~ calid=2584796 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4183, CourtDate:12/05/2014, Courtroom:AD, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:RST, SystemDate:6/18/2014 1:18:03 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: OSC VACATED. ~ calid=2584801 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4184, CourtDate:06/12/2015, Courtroom:AD, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:2, SessionType:OSC, Judge:RST, SystemDate:6/18/2014 1:18:50 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: OSC RE JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: OSC RE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jun 12, 2015 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jun 12, 2015 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Dec 05, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Dec 05, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: REDUCED FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • Docket843X Pmt: Small Claims First Paper File by Assignee w/in SC - Comment: Amount of $181.00 for PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (PL-1). Received from PLAINTIFF, check no(s) 00998993. Receipt #784304 for amount of $181.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC. - JORDAN D. COOK