This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/06/2021 at 07:37:09 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES V. CARRANCO

Case Summary

On 10/29/2012 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CARRANCO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3453

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

CARRANCO, JAVIER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRINKERHOFF, KRISTEN LEIGH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2013
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: OSC ON 10/11/2013 VACATED ~ calid=2070616 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4184, CourtDate:10/11/2013, Courtroom:AD, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:2, SessionType:OSC, Judge:RST, Deputy:DYANAM, SystemDate:10/29/2012 9:45:13 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: OSC ON 5/10/2013 VACATED ~ calid=2070612 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4183, CourtDate:05/10/2013, Courtroom:AD, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:RST, Deputy:DYANAM, SystemDate:10/29/2012 9:44:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Vacated - Default Judgment Entered - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • Docket843X Pmt: Small Claims First Paper File by Assignee w/in SC - Comment: Amount of $181.00 for PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (PL-1). Received from PLAINTIFF, check no(s) 929022. Receipt #683602 for amount of $181.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • DocketImage of Archived Documents - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE 3.740(f)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • DocketImage of Archived Documents - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE 3.740(d)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE REDUCED FIILNG FEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • DocketStatement - Comment: RE CLASSIFICATION AND LOCATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 11, 2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 11, 2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON May 10, 2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON May 10, 2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 213

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristen Brinkerhoff