This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/17/2020 at 09:34:51 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc VS Wolfe

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Wolfe. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0042

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

Defendant

Wolfe, Ashlee L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRINKERHOFF, KRISTEN LEIGH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2021
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: Declaration of Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Declaration - Comment: Re: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.