This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:18:57 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6182

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

WILLIAMS, PHILLIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HENRIQUES, JANALIE A

Attorney at HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Rd #8

San Jose, CA 951191306

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2017
  • Writ Returned Partially Satisfied - Comment: ISSUED 10/16/14 COUNTY OF KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN/MONEY/DKR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • 115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (PL-1). Received from HUNT & HENRIQUES, check no(s) 518310. Receipt #804166 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2013
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA S.A.S.E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • 117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (PL-1). Received from HUNT & HENRIQUES, check no(s) 403183. Receipt #730198 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2013
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED ~ calid=2206192 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4184, CourtDate:03/25/2014, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:2, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LSE, Deputy:RYANB, SystemDate:3/29/2013 11:00:12 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2013
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: 10/8/13 OSC VACATED POS FILED ~ calid=2206190 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4183, CourtDate:10/08/2013, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LSE, Deputy:RYANB, SystemDate:3/29/2013 10:59:49 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO PHILLIP WILLIAMS SUB SERVED 5/14/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: AS TO PHILLIP WILLIAMS WITH 1 ATTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • 843Y Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) - Comment: Amount of $225.00 for PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (PL-1). Received from HUNT & HENRIQUES, check no(s) 268687. Receipt #709885 for amount of $225.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 25, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 25, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 08, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 08, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED BY ABC LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY JANALIE HENRIQUES, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY JANALIE HENRIQUES, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less