This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 12:13:21 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS WILLHELM

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WILLHELM. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0205

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

WILLHELM, LORENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHERRILL, DONALD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: Returned Original via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Awarded Against: WILLHELM, LORENA; Amount; Damages: $3,673.71; Costs: $282.50; Total: $3956.21; Party: Name: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Comment: Total: $3956.21 As To Lorena Willhelm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Counsel Regarding 1. Interest 2. Costs (CCP 1033) 3. Attorney Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: In Support Of Application For Entry Of Default Judgment Pursuant To Civil Code 1788.60 (a)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Court Entered - Comment: As To Lorena Willhelm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: Re: Proof Of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Personal Service As To Lorena Willhelm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 11/30/201612:50 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketStatement - Comment: OF LOCATION/VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less