This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:43:52 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS VILLALOBOS

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VILLALOBOS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Staley, H.A. "Skip", Phillips, Craig G. and Staley, H. A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0036

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

Phillips, Craig G.

Staley, H. A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

VILLALOBOS, ELVIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PIERCE, EMILY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: Re: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Awarded Against: VILLALOBOS, ELVIA; Amount; Damages: $1,998.17; Total: $1998.17; Party: Names: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; VILLALOBOS, ELVIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Comment: Total: $ 1998.17 As To Elvia Villalobos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Regarding In Support Of Application For Entry Of Default Judgment Pursuant To Civil Code 1788.60 (a)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Regarding 1) Compliance With CCP Section 1033 (b)(2) 2) Waiver Of Attorney Fees and Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Court Entered - Comment: As To Elvia Villalobos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without Prejudice As To Does 1 to 25 Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Personal Service As To Elvia Villalobos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Regarding Reduced Filing Fees (Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code 63221.1 (c)(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less