This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/24/2020 at 13:39:55 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS VELOSO

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VELOSO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0069

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

VELOSO, MARILOU D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZIMMERMANN, JOSIE S.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Marilou D Veloso by personal service on 3/11/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 03/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Declaration - Comment: re Reduced Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.