This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:54:31 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS TRUJILLO

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TRUJILLO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5765

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

TRUJILLO, YURISIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRINKERHOFF, KRISTEN LEIGH

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Returned via SASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Awarded Against: TRUJILLO, YURISIA; Amount; Damages: $1,781.23; Costs: $236.00; Total: $2017.23; Party: Names: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; TRUJILLO, YURISIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO JUD -100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • Judgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: AS TO YURISIA TRUJILLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: of Custodian of Records in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to CCP 1788.60(a)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: RE: Compliance with CCP 1033(b)(2) and Waiver of Attorney Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default by Court Entered - Comment: As to Yurisia Trujillo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without Prejudice - As to Does 1-25, Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Yurisia Trujillo. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: RE: REDUCED FILING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less