This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 09:49:02 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS TAVARES

Case Summary

On 09/21/2015 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TAVARES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0085

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

TAVARES, MIGUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRINKERHOFF, KRISTEN LEIGH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: RE:Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: RE:Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Awarded Against: TAVARES, MIGUEL; Amount; Damages: $3,159.20; Costs: $236.00; Total: $3395.20; Party: Names: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; TAVARES, MIGUEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: Total: $3,159.20 as to Miguel Tavares

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Custodian of Records in Support of Request for Judgment CCP 585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: 1) Compliance with CCP Section 1033(b)(2) 2) Waiver of Attorney Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: as to Miguel Tavares

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without Prejudice as to Does 1 to 25 only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: by Personal Service as to Miguel Tavares

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/11/20156:34 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less