This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 09:28:13 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS TARROW

Case Summary

On 09/15/2016 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TARROW. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K. and Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0493

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

TARROW, CHARLES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RITTON, JAIME YOSHIMI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: RITTON, JAIME YOSHIMI; Awarded Against: TARROW, CHARLES; Amount; Damages: $3,590.12; Costs: $282.50; Total: $3872.62; Party: Names: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; TARROW, CHARLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: in support of application for entry of default judgment pursuant to civil code 1788.60(a)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: CHARLES TARROW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.