Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 08:28:39 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS TAMAYO

Case Summary

On 08/28/2015 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TAMAYO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0127

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

TAMAYO, DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRINKERHOFF, KRISTEN LEIGH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; BRINKERHOFF, KRISTEN LEIGH; Awarded Against: TAMAYO, DAVID; Amount; Damages: $1,594.33; Costs: $236.00; Total: $1830.33; Party: Names: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; TAMAYO, DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re Plaintiff's Waiver of Difference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Custodian of Records in Support of Request for Judgment CCP 585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Served: 09/28/20157:50 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: REDUCED FILING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristen Brinkerhoff