This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:46:51 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS SPURLOCK

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SPURLOCK. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Pritchard, Kenneth G. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0220

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

SPURLOCK, KAREN L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT, MICHAEL S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Awarded Against: SPURLOCK, KAREN L; Amount; Damages: $3,358.55; Costs: $282.50; Total: $3641.05; Party: Names: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; SPURLOCK, KAREN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: CORRECTED WITH BETTER SEAL STAMP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Abstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Judgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: INTEREST, COSTS, FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less