This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 17:58:32 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS SILVA

Case Summary

On 01/20/2015 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SILVA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Errea, Larry A.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9292

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Errea, Larry A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

SILVA, BRENDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PIERCE, EMILY

Attorney at PORTFOLIO RECOVERY

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2016
  • Docket4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Errea, Larry A.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: AS TO BRENDA SILVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jan 08, 2016 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jan 08, 2016 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 24, 2015 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 24, 2015 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • Docket843X Pmt: Small Claims First Paper File by Assignee w/in SC - Comment: Amount of $181.00 for PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (PL-1). Received from ABC LEGAL SERVICES, INC., check no(s) 01018056. Receipt #820289 for amount of $181.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Document Image: RE: REDUCED FILING FEES (CAL.BUS. & PROF. CODE 6322.1(C)(1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.