This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/23/2018 at 13:12:04 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS SAUCEDO

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SAUCEDO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Palmer, William D. and Shayer, Steven. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0081

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Palmer, William D.

Shayer, Steven

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

SAUCEDO, ALEX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRINKERHOFF, KRISTEN LEIGH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Palmer, William D.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Awarded Against: SAUCEDO, ALEX; Amount; Damages: $2,097.02; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $0.00; Other: $0.00; Total: $2097.02; Party: Names: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; SAUCEDO, ALEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Judgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Palmer, William D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: DOES 1 TO 25 ONLY. WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: RE: 1) COMPLIANCE WITH CCP SECTION 1033(B)(2) 1) WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE 1788.60(A)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: RE: REDUCED FILING FEES (CAL.BUS & PROF. CODE 6322.1(C)(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less