This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 08:47:49 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS ROBLES

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROBLES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0092

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

ROBLES, GEORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMS LORI N

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/23/2022: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

11/23/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

11/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Declaration

11/23/2022: Declaration

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

11/23/2022: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

11/23/2022: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

12/07/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f); Dept.: Lamont Division B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d); Dept.: Lamont Division B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: Re: Venue; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS LORI NICOLE