This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:48:28 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS RIGGS

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RIGGS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1817

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

RIGGS, BILLY L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RITTON, JAIME YOSHIMI

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 10/10/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Re: imposition of additional sanctions as to plaintiff's counsel for failure to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.740 and failure to appear at the Order to Show Cause hearing heard on October 10 ,2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 10/10/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: 1 ATTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less