This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:19:20 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC VS ORTIZ

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ORTIZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0394

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

ORTIZ, LOIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT, MICHAEL S

Attorney at HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Rd #8

San Jose, CA 951191306

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2014
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: FAILURE TO PROCEED TO JUDGMENT FAILURE TO PROCEED TO JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: NO PROOF OF SERVICE NO PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • 117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC (PL-1). Received from HUNT & HENRIQUES, check no(s) 391993. Receipt #722415 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • Abstract Issued - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: JUDGMENT ISSUED ~ calid=2203310 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4184, CourtDate:03/24/2014, Courtroom:AT, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:2, SessionType:OSC, Judge:CP, Deputy:yeseniat, SystemDate:3/27/2013 8:47:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: JUDGMENT FOR: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC JUDGMENT AGAINST: LOIS ORTIZ PRINCIPLE/DAMAGES: $3,167.07 PREJUGMENT INTEREST: $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES: $0.00 COSTS: $284.00 TOTAL: $3,451.07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • Declaration - Comment: OF COUNSEL RE: 1.INTEREST 2.COSTS(CCP 1033) 3. ATTORNEY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: RE: LOIS ORTIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ~ calid=2203308 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4183, CourtDate:09/23/2013, Courtroom:AT, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:CP, Deputy:yeseniat, SystemDate:3/27/2013 8:46:27 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • Proof of Service - Comment: WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, STATEMENT OF LOCATION/VENUE; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ADR PACKET, NOTICE OF OSC WHO SERVED: LOIS ORTIZ HOW SERVED: PERSONAL SERVICE DATE SERVED: 04/05/13 COST: $59.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 24, 2014 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AT OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 24, 2014 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AT OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 23, 2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AT OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 23, 2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AT OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Complaint - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • 843Y Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) - Comment: Amount of $225.00 for PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC (PL-1). Received from HUNT & HENRIQUES, check no(s) 368677. Receipt #709214 for amount of $225.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 737

    Read MoreRead Less