This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 11:38:16 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS ORTIZ

Case Summary

On 08/07/2017 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ORTIZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tafoya, Robert S. and Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0231

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tafoya, Robert S.

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

ORTIZ, MARGARITA C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HUNT, MICHAEL S

COLLINS, EMILY B.

HENRIQUES, JANALIE A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Awarded Against: ORTIZ, MARGARITA C; Amount; Damages: $1,533.24; Costs: $240.50; Total: $1773.74; Party: Names: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; ORTIZ, MARGARITA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketDeclaration in Lieu of Testimony Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Served: 09/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Reduced Filing Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less