This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/13/2020 at 08:54:41 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS MUNOZ

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MUNOZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0099

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

MUNOZ, EVERARDO Z

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRINKERHOFF, KRISTEN LEIGH

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 02/24/202010:03 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: FOR EVERARDO Z MUNOZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.