This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 15:30:37 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS MORENO

Case Summary

On 01/15/2016 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MORENO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bittleston, Dawn and Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0014

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bittleston, Dawn

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

MORENO, MELITON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIPIERO, ANTHONY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Other Court-Ordered Dism Before Trial (CL/CV); Party: Names: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; MORENO, MELITON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) (After Cond Settlement/Stay) - Comment: Without Prejudice, Entire Action, Duly Filed and Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Appear - Comment: mailed to the Plaintiff's attorney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Comment: on Settlement Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • DocketStipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Conditional (JBSIS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Served: 01/29/20169:14 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.